LA SB74 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
Pending: House Administration of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
Pending: House Administration of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires insurance for persons handling explosives. (8/1/18)
Title
Requires insurance for persons handling explosives. (8/1/18)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 74 FINAL PASSAGE (#336) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |