LA SB73 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Hearing: Apr 24 @ 9:30 am in Room 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Hearing: Apr 24 @ 9:30 am in Room 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates and provides for the Community Sewerage System Infrastructure Sustainability Act. (1/1/25) (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Title
Creates and provides for the Community Sewerage System Infrastructure Sustainability Act. (1/1/25) (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Sponsors
Sen. Glen Womack [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 73 FINAL PASSAGE (#268) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-10 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality. |