LA SB72 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the office on women's health within the Louisiana Department of Health. (gov sig) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the office on women's health within the Louisiana Department of Health. (gov sig) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Carter [D] | Sen. Regina Barrow [D] | Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D] | Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D] |
Sen. Beth Mizell [R] | Sen. Rogers Pope [R] | Sen. Gregory Tarver [D] | Sen. Rick Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |