LA SB69 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 8/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 8/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Louisiana Department of Health to sell or transfer title to certain property. (8/1/19) (EN INCREASE SD RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes the Louisiana Department of Health to sell or transfer title to certain property. (8/1/19) (EN INCREASE SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 69 FINAL PASSAGE (#739) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 69 FINAL PASSAGE (#360) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 69 FINAL PASSAGE (#360) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2019. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 342. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-05-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19. |
2019-05-23 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-22 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2019-05-21 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-16 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2019-05-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |