LA SB652 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-20 - Called from the Calendar. Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the Classroom Protection Act. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the Classroom Protection Act. (gov sig)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-20SenateCalled from the Calendar. Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate.
2014-05-12SenateThe amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2014-05-12SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted.
2014-05-06SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2014-05-05SenateReported with amendments.
2014-04-02SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2014-04-01SenateRules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback