LA SB63 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-12-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 1/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-12-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 1/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the duties of the Department of Children and Family Services regarding victims of child sex trafficking. (1/1/23) (EN +$1,943,975 GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the duties of the Department of Children and Family Services regarding victims of child sex trafficking. (1/1/23) (EN +$1,943,975 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 63 FINAL PASSAGE (#1462) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 63 CO-AUTHORS (#603) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 63 FINAL PASSAGE (#602) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 63 CO-AUTHORS (#603) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 63 FINAL PASSAGE (#602) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2023. |
2022-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 662. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022. |
2022-06-01 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-31 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-26 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-05-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-05-17 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered re- reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-15 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |