LA SB620 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Cemetery Board to issue subpoenas, conduct investigations, and issue cease and desist orders. (8/15/10)
Title
Authorizes the Cemetery Board to issue subpoenas, conduct investigations, and issue cease and desist orders. (8/15/10)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 620, FINAL PASSAGE (#1581) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 620, FINAL PASSAGE (#354) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 620, FINAL PASSAGE (#354) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Effective date 8/15/10. | |
2010-07-06 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 965. | |
2010-06-18 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-17 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-16 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-06-16 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-16 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-06-10 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010. | |
2010-06-10 | Notice given. | |
2010-05-20 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-05-13 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 20, 2010. | |
2010-05-13 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-12 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-05-11 | Reported favorably (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-04-27 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-04-26 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-04-26 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-22 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-21 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |
2010-03-19 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |