LA SB606 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 50-17-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 50-17-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to religious freedom. (8/15/10) (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to religious freedom. (8/15/10) (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, CONCUR (#1950) (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 606, FINAL PASSAGE (#1810) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, CO-AUTHORS (#1029) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, FINAL PASSAGE (#1028) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, FINAL PASSAGE (#1027) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 3599 BY CLAITOR (#1026) (Y: 6 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 3590 BY CLAITOR (#1025) (Y: 6 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 3836 BY CLAITOR (#1024) (Y: 6 N: 25 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 4650 BY CLAITOR (#1023) (Y: 5 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 3594 BY CLAITOR (#1022) (Y: 5 N: 25 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 3950 BY CLAITOR (#1021) (Y: 6 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 3598 BY CLAITOR (#1020) (Y: 5 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 3589 BY CLAITOR (#1019) (Y: 5 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 3587 BY CLAITOR (#1018) (Y: 5 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 3584 BY CLAITOR (#1017) (Y: 5 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB606, SUSPEND THE RULES (#686) (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 606, FINAL PASSAGE (#1810) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, CO-AUTHORS (#1029) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, FINAL PASSAGE (#1028) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, FINAL PASSAGE (#1027) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 3599 BY CLAITOR (#1026) (Y: 6 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 3590 BY CLAITOR (#1025) (Y: 6 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 3836 BY CLAITOR (#1024) (Y: 6 N: 25 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 4650 BY CLAITOR (#1023) (Y: 5 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 3594 BY CLAITOR (#1022) (Y: 5 N: 25 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 3950 BY CLAITOR (#1021) (Y: 6 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 3598 BY CLAITOR (#1020) (Y: 5 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 3589 BY CLAITOR (#1019) (Y: 5 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 3587 BY CLAITOR (#1018) (Y: 5 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, AMENDMENT # 3584 BY CLAITOR (#1017) (Y: 5 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB606, SUSPEND THE RULES (#686) (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date 8/15/10. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 793. | |
2010-06-21 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/23. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-21 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-20 | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 6 nays. | |
2010-06-18 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-06-18 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010. | |
2010-06-17 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-06-16 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-15 | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-09 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2010-06-08 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-06-07 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 6 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-07 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-05-25 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2010-05-19 | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-19 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | |
2010-05-18 | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | |
2010-05-18 | Read by title; ordered engrossed. | |
2010-05-18 | Committee amendments read and adopted. | |
2010-05-18 | Rules suspended | |
2010-05-18 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary A. | |
2010-03-19 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Judiciary A. |