LA SB6 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 9:30 am in Room A-B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for a tax deduction for certain expenses incurred by teachers. (gov sig) (EG DECREASE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for a tax deduction for certain expenses incurred by teachers. (gov sig) (EG DECREASE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2019-04-15SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-02-18SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback