LA SB59 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Adds physician assistants to persons eligible for reduction to their individual income tax. (8/1/19) (EG -$60,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds physician assistants to persons eligible for reduction to their individual income tax. (8/1/19) (EG -$60,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 59 FINAL PASSAGE (#76) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-16SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-15SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-03-26SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB59&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1118849
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124562
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125572
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124232
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124648
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1118850
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124194
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125124
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125367
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125619
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125545

Bill Comments

feedback