LA SB59 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Effective date 6/14/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to prescription drug price information. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to prescription drug price information. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 59 CONCUR (#663) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 59 FINAL PASSAGE (#610) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 59 FINAL PASSAGE (#272) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14SenateEffective date 6/14/2017.
2017-06-14SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 236.
2017-06-05SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2017-06-04HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2017-06-03SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-02SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
2017-06-01SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2017-06-01HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2017-05-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/01/17.
2017-05-25HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-05-24HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2017-05-23HouseReported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-15HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2017-05-11HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2017-05-10SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-05-10SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2017-05-09SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2017-05-08SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-05-03SenateReported with amendments.
2017-04-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2017-03-28SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=SB59&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1027791
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1038316
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040610
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047690
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1051695
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1037267
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040496
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1039905
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043538
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044010
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043932
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044247
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046269
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047279
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1027792
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1039490
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040716
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1039748
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1051185
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040545
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047090
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047402

Bill Comments

feedback