LA SB58 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Designates LA Highway 3170 in Rapides Parish as the "Cecil R. Blair Memorial Highway". (8/1/18)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates LA Highway 3170 in Rapides Parish as the "Cecil R. Blair Memorial Highway". (8/1/18)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House Vote on SB 58 FINAL PASSAGE (#732) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 58 FINAL PASSAGE (#182) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateEffective date 8/1/2018.
2018-05-15SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 222.
2018-05-09SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-08HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-08SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-07SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2018-05-03HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/03/18.
2018-04-18HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-17HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-16HouseReported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-03HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2018-04-02HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-02SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-27SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-26SenateReported favorably.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2018-02-21SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback