LA SB57 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-20 - Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-20 - Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes reporting requirements for businesses and governmental entities using service providers. (2/3 - CA7s2.1(A)) (1/1/21) (Item #23) (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Establishes reporting requirements for businesses and governmental entities using service providers. (2/3 - CA7s2.1(A)) (1/1/21) (Item #23) (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 57 FINAL PASSAGE (#133) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-20 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |