LA SB565 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-20 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-20 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the purposes of certain collections in the city of Shreveport. (7/1/10) (RE1 NO IMPACT SD EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the purposes of certain collections in the city of Shreveport. (7/1/10) (RE1 NO IMPACT SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 565, FINAL PASSAGE (#1808) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 565, FINAL PASSAGE (#696) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 565, FINAL PASSAGE (#696) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-20 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2010-06-20 | Rules suspended | |
2010-06-18 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-06-18 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010. | |
2010-06-17 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2010-06-17 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-06-16 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-06-15 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-14 | Reported with amendments (18-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-24 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2010-05-20 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-19 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-18 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-17 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |
2010-03-19 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |