LA SB562 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to virtual schools. (gov sig) (OR NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to virtual schools. (gov sig) (OR NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 562 FINAL PASSAGE (#1184) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 562 FINAL PASSAGE (#467) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-17SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-16SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2018-05-16HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18.
2018-05-11HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-05-10HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-05-08HouseReported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-23HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-04-19HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-19SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-18SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-17SenateSubstitute for Senate Bill No. 95. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback