LA SB54 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date 8/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date 8/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for an automatic filing extension for individual income tax returns. (8/1/22) (EN -$1,900,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for an automatic filing extension for individual income tax returns. (8/1/22) (EN -$1,900,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 54 CONCUR (#1161) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 54 FINAL PASSAGE (#1322) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 54 FINAL PASSAGE (#72) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 54 FINAL PASSAGE (#1322) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 54 FINAL PASSAGE (#72) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2022. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 410. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2022-06-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2022-06-01 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2022. |
2022-05-18 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-17 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-16 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-04-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2022-03-29 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |