LA SB536 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to workers' compensation. (8/1/18)
Title
Provides relative to workers' compensation. (8/1/18)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 536 FINAL PASSAGE (#596) (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 12 yeas and 22 nays. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |