LA SB524 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Sabine River Authority to obtain approval of the Water Resources Commission prior to the sale of water outside the state. (8/1/18)
Title
Requires the Sabine River Authority to obtain approval of the Water Resources Commission prior to the sale of water outside the state. (8/1/18)
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Long [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 524 FINAL PASSAGE (#1181) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 524 FINAL PASSAGE (#543) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 524 FINAL PASSAGE (#543) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2018. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 474. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18. |
2018-05-11 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-10 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-05-08 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-27 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2018-04-26 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |