LA SB519 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 564.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 564.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to behavioral health services providers. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to behavioral health services providers. (gov sig)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Senate | Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 564. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported by substitute. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |