LA SB518 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date 6/12/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date 6/12/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the St. Tammany Parish Hospital Service District No. 2. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to the St. Tammany Parish Hospital Service District No. 2. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 518 FINAL PASSAGE (#583) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 518 FINAL PASSAGE (#283) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 518 FINAL PASSAGE (#283) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-12 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2020. |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 365. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020. |
2020-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-05-29 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20. |
2020-05-28 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-28 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-05-28 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-05-28 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-22 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Substitute for Senate Bill No. 485. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |