LA SB51 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the qualifications for certified medication attendants. (8/1/19)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the qualifications for certified medication attendants. (8/1/19)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 51 FINAL PASSAGE (#101) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-04-23HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-23SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-17SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-16SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-25SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback