LA SB51 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the death penalty. (8/1/18)
Title
Eliminates the death penalty. (8/1/18)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |