LA SB494 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to coverage for mastectomies and reconstructive surgery. (1/1/21)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to coverage for mastectomies and reconstructive surgery. (1/1/21)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 494 FINAL PASSAGE (#126) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-20HouseReported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-13HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-05-11SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-07SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-03-31SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB494&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168220
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169935
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171279
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169439
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170749
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170876
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173484
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174326
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168222
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170669
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171454
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174328
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171234

Bill Comments

feedback