LA SB489 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Effective date 7/1/2026.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for duties of the State Fire Marshal. (1/1/26)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for duties of the State Fire Marshal. (1/1/26)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 489 CONCUR (#1353) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 489 FINAL PASSAGE (#1605) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 489 FINAL PASSAGE (#1366) (Y: 48 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 489 FINAL PASSAGE (#624) (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-10SenateEffective date 7/1/2026.
2024-06-10SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 534.
2024-05-31SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2024-05-31HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2024-05-31SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2024-05-30SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
2024-05-29SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2024-05-29HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2024-05-29HouseCalled from the calendar.
2024-05-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2024.
2024-05-28HouseNotice given.
2024-05-28HouseRead by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
2024-05-23HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 48, nays 34. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
2024-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2024.
2024-05-22HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2024-05-21HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2024-05-20HouseReported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2024-05-15HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2024-05-14HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2024-05-13SenateThe bill, as previously amended, was read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 5 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2024-05-13SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2024-05-13SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2024-05-13SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted.
2024-05-13SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2024-04-30SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2024-04-30SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted.
2024-04-29SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2024-04-24SenateReported with amendments.
2024-04-03SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2024-04-02SenateRules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=24rs&b=SB489&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1361492
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1369107
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1374033
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1380522
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1382239
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1368758
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1368124
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1368099
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1368859
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1370256
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1373419
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1375821
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1375915
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1376397
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1376736
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1377616
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1378049
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1379322
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1361493
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1370172
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1374057
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1376490
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1380046
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1385014
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1373909
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1378437
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1379960
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1380416

Bill Comments

feedback