LA SB482 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-19 - Effective date 6/19/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-19 - Effective date 6/19/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Louisiana Rehabilitation Services.
Title
Provides relative to the Louisiana Rehabilitation Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 482 CONCUR (#1597) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 482 FINAL PASSAGE (#1385) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 482 FINAL PASSAGE (#587) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 482 FINAL PASSAGE (#1385) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 482 FINAL PASSAGE (#587) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | Effective date 6/19/2014. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 761. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2014-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2014-05-29 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2014. |
2014-05-21 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-05-20 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2014-05-19 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-05-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2014-05-05 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |