LA SB48 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the minimum ACT score for TOPS eligibility and TOPS award amounts. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the minimum ACT score for TOPS eligibility and TOPS award amounts. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Donahue [R] | Sen. Conrad Appel [R] | Rep. Roy Burrell [D] | Rep. Thomas Carmody [R] |
Rep. Stephen Carter [R] | Rep. Charles Kleckley [R] | Sen. Alan Seabaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 48 CONCUR (#653) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 48 FINAL PASSAGE (#692) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 48 FINAL PASSAGE (#154) (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 48 SB 48 BY DONAHUE (#154) (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 48 AMENDMENT # 1188 BY GALLOT SB 48 BY DONAHUE (#153) (Y: 10 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 48 FINAL PASSAGE (#692) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 48 FINAL PASSAGE (#154) (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 48 SB 48 BY DONAHUE (#154) (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 48 AMENDMENT # 1188 BY GALLOT SB 48 BY DONAHUE (#153) (Y: 10 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2015-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 28 yeas and 6 nays. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2015-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 33. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-02 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2015-06-02 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2015-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2015. |
2015-05-26 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2015-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-05-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-04-30 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 9 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |