LA SB476 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date 5/30/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date 5/30/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the salary of the marshal of the City Court of Natchitoches. (gov sig)
Title
Increases the salary of the marshal of the City Court of Natchitoches. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Long [R] | Rep. Terry Brown [I] | Rep. Kenny Cox [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 476 FINAL PASSAGE (#1203) (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 476 FINAL PASSAGE (#330) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 476 FINAL PASSAGE (#330) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | Effective date 5/30/2018. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 601. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18. |
2018-05-15 | House | Notice given. |
2018-05-07 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/18. |
2018-04-23 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-19 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-18 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |