LA SB465 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-17 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to freestanding emergency medical care facilities. (8/1/16)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to freestanding emergency medical care facilities. (8/1/16)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-17SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2016-05-12SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2016-05-11SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2016-04-06SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2016-04-05SenateRules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback