LA SB462 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes public entities to enter into public-private partnerships. (gov sig)
Title
Authorizes public entities to enter into public-private partnerships. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 462 FINAL PASSAGE (#571) (Y: 13 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 13 yeas and 23 nays. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |