LA SB456 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for certain solar power generation facilities. (8/1/22)
Title
Provides for certain solar power generation facilities. (8/1/22)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Senate | Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |