LA SB455 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date 8/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the limitation on size of containers of beverages of high alcoholic content. (8/1/20)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the limitation on size of containers of beverages of high alcoholic content. (8/1/20)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 455 CONCUR (#622) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 455 FINAL PASSAGE (#535) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 455 FINAL PASSAGE (#121) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-12SenateEffective date 8/1/2020.
2020-06-12SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 319.
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-29SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-05-28SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-05-28HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20.
2020-05-22HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-21HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-20HouseReported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-13HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2020-05-11SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-07SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2020-03-31SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB455&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168044
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170530
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171277
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178056
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182519
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170704
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174461
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174075
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177019
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168045
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170550
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171396
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174456
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180764
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171223
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176917
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177934

Bill Comments

feedback