LA SB450 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Effective date 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts from seizure payments received under governmental entities as a result of an outstanding emergency event. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts from seizure payments received under governmental entities as a result of an outstanding emergency event. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 450 CONCUR (#442) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 450 FINAL PASSAGE (#472) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 450 FINAL PASSAGE (#120) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-04SenateEffective date 6/4/2020.
2020-06-04SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 44.
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-29SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-28SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-05-27SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-05-27HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 2. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-20HouseReported with amendments (13-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-13HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2020-05-11SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-07SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2020-03-31SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB450&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168015
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169729
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177204
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179927
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169389
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173196
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173975
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175024
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176665
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168018
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170519
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173973
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171221
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176532
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177135

Bill Comments

feedback