LA SB437 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to postsecondary education management board sick leave policies. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to postsecondary education management board sick leave policies. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 437 CO-AUTHORS (#286) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 437 FINAL PASSAGE (#285) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-05-21SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-21SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2020-05-19SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2020-05-14SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-03-31SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB437&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1167974
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172427
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175151
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172679
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1167976
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170566
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172574
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172546
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174117
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175195
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175094
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175096

Bill Comments

feedback