LA SB434 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for immunity from prosecution and post-conviction relief for victims of human trafficking. (gov sig)
Title
Provides for immunity from prosecution and post-conviction relief for victims of human trafficking. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-14 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |