LA SB432 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority Board to develop a coastal master plan, at a minimum every six years. (8/1/18)
Title
Requires the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority Board to develop a coastal master plan, at a minimum every six years. (8/1/18)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 432 CONCUR (#826) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Vote on SB 432 FINAL PASSAGE (#738) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 432 FINAL PASSAGE (#373) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Vote on SB 432 FINAL PASSAGE (#738) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 432 FINAL PASSAGE (#373) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2018. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 244. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-03 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/18. |
2018-04-19 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-18 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-17 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |