LA SB426 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires health insurance coverage for COVID-19 (Coronavirus) diagnostic testing. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires health insurance coverage for COVID-19 (Coronavirus) diagnostic testing. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 426 FINAL PASSAGE (#187) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-20HouseReported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-18HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-05-15HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2020-05-14SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-07SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-03-16SenateRules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB426&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1166159
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169934
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172596
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169487
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171610
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174091
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174320
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1166162
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170673
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172739
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174321
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172463

Bill Comments

feedback