LA SB423 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date 6/30/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date 6/30/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for reserve investigators in the Louisiana Inspector General's Office. (gov sig)
Title
Provides for reserve investigators in the Louisiana Inspector General's Office. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 423, FINAL PASSAGE (#1679) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 423, FINAL PASSAGE (#457) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 423, FINAL PASSAGE (#457) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date 6/30/10. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 783. | |
2010-06-20 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-06-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-18 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-06-17 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-06-17 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/17/2010. | |
2010-06-10 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. | |
2010-06-09 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-08 | Reported favorably (11-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-05 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-05-04 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-03 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-29 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-28 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-03-18 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |