LA SB416 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-20 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to a disciplinarian or other school administrator to ride on a school bus transporting students to and from school. (gov sig) (RE INCREASE LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to a disciplinarian or other school administrator to ride on a school bus transporting students to and from school. (gov sig) (RE INCREASE LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 416 FINAL PASSAGE (#709) (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-20HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2024-05-15HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2024-05-14SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 14 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2024-05-14SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2024-05-14SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2024-05-13SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2024-05-08SenateReported with amendments.
2024-03-27SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2024-03-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=24rs&b=SB416&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1358290
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1373046
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1374598
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1366283
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1372968
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1374406
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1358291
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1362227
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1374031
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1373991
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1374698
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1374740
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1374548

Bill Comments

feedback