LA SB41 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-05 - Effective date 11/5/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-05 - Effective date 11/5/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to provisional licenses issued by the state fire marshal. (gov sig) (Item #32)
Title
Provides relative to provisional licenses issued by the state fire marshal. (gov sig) (Item #32)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - House - House Vote on SB 41 FINAL PASSAGE (#176) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 41 FINAL PASSAGE (#59) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 41 FINAL PASSAGE (#59) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-05 | Senate | Effective date 11/5/2020. |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 54. |
2020-10-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-10-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-10-20 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/20/20. |
2020-10-19 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-19 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-19 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-10-19 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-10-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2020-10-12 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |