LA SB41 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the regulation of pharmacy benefit managers. (See Act) (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the regulation of pharmacy benefit managers. (See Act) (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 41 CONCUR (#656) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 41 FINAL PASSAGE (#735) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 41 APPROPRIATIONS (#618) (Y: 25 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 41 FINAL PASSAGE (#303) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 41 AMENDMENT # 1711 BY CLAITOR ADOPT (#302) (Y: 9 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateEffective date: See Act.
2019-06-06SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 124.
2019-06-04SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-06-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-01SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-31SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
2019-05-30SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2019-05-30HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
2019-05-23HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-22HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-21HouseReported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-05-09HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-08SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-08SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2019-04-29SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2019-04-25SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-24SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-22SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB41&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1117092
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127227
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132842
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140563
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143721
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127066
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127359
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132582
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132563
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132546
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132772
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135428
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135337
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136501
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136608
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139643
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139541
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137306
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140027
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1117093
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127830
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132915
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136492
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140855
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143781
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132777
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138507
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139881
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140441

Bill Comments

feedback