LA SB399 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the election sections for judgeship of the second district of the First Circuit Court of Appeal. (2/3 - CA5s9) (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the election sections for judgeship of the second district of the First Circuit Court of Appeal. (2/3 - CA5s9) (gov sig)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-23SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2024-04-22SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2024-04-17SenateReported with amendments.
2024-03-26SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2024-03-25SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback