LA SB399 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-23 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-23 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts motor carriers of nonhazardous oil field waste, nonhazardous industrial solid waste and hazardous waste from proving public convenience and necessity. (gov sig)
Title
Exempts motor carriers of nonhazardous oil field waste, nonhazardous industrial solid waste and hazardous waste from proving public convenience and necessity. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Morrish [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 399 FINAL PASSAGE (#573) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2016-05-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2016-05-04 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 5 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |