LA SB397 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 6/18/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 6/18/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the classification of the assistant police chief in the city of Westwego. (gov sig)
Title
Provides for the classification of the assistant police chief in the city of Westwego. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 397 FINAL PASSAGE (#1430) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 397 FINAL PASSAGE (#265) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 397 FINAL PASSAGE (#265) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/18/2022. |
2022-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 704. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022. |
2022-05-24 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-23 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-19 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-04-19 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2022-04-18 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |