LA SB388 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-13 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 517.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-13 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 517.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to financial security for survivors of law enforcement officers. (8/1/20) (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Title
Provides relative to financial security for survivors of law enforcement officers. (8/1/20) (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Sponsors
Sen. Cleo Fields [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-13 | Senate | Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 517. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Reported by substitute. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |