LA SB37 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-23 - Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-23 - Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To provide relative to the capital outlay process. (gov sig) (Item #15) (EGF NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
To provide relative to the capital outlay process. (gov sig) (Item #15) (EGF NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Mack White [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 37 REJECT (#205) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Vote on SB 37 FINAL PASSAGE (#224) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Vote on SB 37 AMENDMENT # 707 BY MAGEE MOTION TO ADOPT (#223) (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 37 FINAL PASSAGE (#48) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Vote on SB 37 FINAL PASSAGE (#224) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Vote on SB 37 AMENDMENT # 707 BY MAGEE MOTION TO ADOPT (#223) (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 37 FINAL PASSAGE (#48) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-23 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2020-10-22 | House | House conferees appointed: Zeringue, Magee, and Coussan. |
2020-10-22 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: White, Tarver, and Barrow. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2020-10-21 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-21 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-10-14 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-10-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/14/20. |
2020-10-13 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-13 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-13 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-10-13 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-10-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |