LA SB365 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Hearing: May 27 @ 11:00 am in Room 1
Hearing: May 27 @ 8:30 am in Room 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that information be provided to students about high-demand, high-wage jobs during the development and revision of their individual graduation plans. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that information be provided to students about high-demand, high-wage jobs during the development and revision of their individual graduation plans. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 365 CO-AUTHORS (#243) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 365 FINAL PASSAGE (#242) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-20HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-05-18SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-15SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage.
2020-05-14SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-02-28SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB365&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164182
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172431
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173762
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172724
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173440
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172820
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164183
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172521
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173931
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173734
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173735

Bill Comments

feedback