LA SB364 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective date 6/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to free expression on college campuses. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to free expression on college campuses. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 364 CONCUR (#1267) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 364 FINAL PASSAGE (#1118) (Y: 58 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 364 AMENDMENT # 4585 BY SMITH MOTION TO ADOPT (#1117) (Y: 32 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 364 CO-AUTHORS (#371) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 364 FINAL PASSAGE (#370) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01SenateEffective date 6/1/2018.
2018-06-01SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 666.
2018-05-18SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-18SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-17SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-16SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 58, nays 26. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-15HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-05-15HouseRead by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/18.
2018-05-07HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-05-03HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-05-02HouseReported with amendments (8-4). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-04-12HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-11SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-10SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-09SenateReported with amendments.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-03-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB364&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073157
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083628
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085637
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098606
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103657
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083542
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084395
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092600
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1091805
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1091508
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097443
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097331
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097165
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097518
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097752
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073159
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085040
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085769
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102229
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085529
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085530
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097519
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098447

Bill Comments

feedback