LA SB362 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates regional authority for certain infrastructure needs and provides relative to taxing powers and uses. (gov sig) (RE1 INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Title
Creates regional authority for certain infrastructure needs and provides relative to taxing powers and uses. (gov sig) (RE1 INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 362 FINAL PASSAGE (#259) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-04-13 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-04-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2018-04-05 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |