LA SB36 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to emergency departments. (8/1/19) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to emergency departments. (8/1/19) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 36 FINAL PASSAGE (#57) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-04-17HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-16SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-10SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-09SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-20SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB36&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1116975
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123520
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125067
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123469
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124665
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1116976
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123301
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123859
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124248
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125157
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124989

Bill Comments

feedback