LA SB344 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the regulation of sports wagering. (8/1/22) (RE -$200,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the regulation of sports wagering. (8/1/22) (RE -$200,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |